WAFC LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Washington A.F.C is a community club striving to provide access to football for all. Based from our North East sports facility in Washington we encourage children from age 4 to learn and develop their skills, we provide training for age groups from under 7s to under 18s and aim to have at least one team in every age division up to Under 18s.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Durham
- Gateshead
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 20 May 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK GIBBON | Chair | 22 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Robert Bradley Cutler | Trustee | 05 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Gary David Sykes | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £132.43k | £157.43k | £323.82k | £334.35k | £312.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £168.21k | £111.98k | £229.22k | £435.70k | £290.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 April 2021 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 April 2021 | 67 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/03/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/04/2013
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF FOOTBALL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WAFC Limited
The Northern Area Playing Fields
Stephenson Road
Washington
Tyne and Wear
NE37 3HR
- Phone:
- 01914173239
- Email:
- info@washingtonafc.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window