Accounts and annual returns KINVER PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1151804
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2020 31 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 31 May 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2019 16 February 2021 261 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 16 February 2021 261 days late
Annual return 31 July 2018 22 May 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 22 May 2019 On Time