Financial history THE BARRY ANTHONY NEWSAM CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1151402
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 20/08/2020 20/08/2021 20/08/2022 20/08/2023 20/08/2024
Total gross income £8.40k £3.82k £5.03k £5.70k £13.21k
Total expenditure £9.88k £7.44k £8.15k £15.45k £8.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A