AMMANFORD A F C

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide football in a structured and safe environment for all age and gender groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Carmarthenshire
Governance
- 30 July 2013: Standard registration
- AMMANFORD ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL CLUB (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WILLIAM JOHN THOMAS | Trustee | 16 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN DAVIES | Trustee | 16 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALAN JONES | Trustee | 16 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2018 | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.35k | £285.67k | £74.91k | £24.55k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.59k | £119.13k | £136.96k | £50.20k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £134.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 33 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 33 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 398 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 398 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 09 June 2022 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 20 October 2021 | 203 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 20 October 2021 | 203 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 AUG 1992 AS AMENDED ON 01/07/2013
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF AMMANFORD AND SURROUNDING AREA BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING FOOTBALL
Contact information
- Address:
-
38 Tycroes Road
Tycroes
Ammanford
SA18 3NT
- Phone:
- 07980904864
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window