SEEDS FOR THE FUTURE (LESOTHO)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is based in Wales and fund-raises to support community development in Ramabanta, Lesotho. Through our partners in Lesotho we support young people with secondary school scholarships which fund fees, uniform, books, travel costs & accommodation.We also fund monthly food parcels for vulnerable households, usually consisting of orphans or disabled people, who have no income.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Other Finance
- Lesotho
Governance
- 27 September 2013: Standard registration
- SEEDS FOR THE FUTURE (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Olivia Louise McLaren | Trustee | 29 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Cenydd Huw Burden Bsc., PHD | Trustee | 06 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard Geoffrey Goodwin | Trustee | 25 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA LEECH BSc | Trustee | 20 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES ERNEST TAYLOR | Trustee | 20 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
SIAN ELIZABETH TAYLOR-JONES BSc,MSc | Trustee | 20 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.34k | £12.16k | £14.02k | £17.04k | £14.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.65k | £12.69k | £18.79k | £17.56k | £13.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 March 2024 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 February 2023 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 March 2022 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 February 2021 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED AS AMENDED ON 22/08/2013
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND ADVANCE THE WELLBEING OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE KINGDOM OF LESOTHO, SOUTHERN AFRICA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Mill Close
Llanishen
Cardiff
CF14 0XQ
- Phone:
- 02920751401
- Email:
- seedsftf@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window