CANTERBURY UMBRELLA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supplying facilities for recreation, education, refreshment, companionship and general care for people with mental or physical disability, sickness or disorder.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kent
Governance
- 10 September 2013: Standard registration
- 12 January 2016: Funds received from 298480 CANTERBURY UMBRELLA
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTINA JOANNA ESCOTT MCGIRR | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY WILLIAM HOLLIS BEM | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thelma Anne Taylor | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Paul Taylor | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Geoffrey Milham | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Clarke | Trustee | 14 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
diana margaret jackson | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
BARRIE JOHN GORE | Trustee | 19 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN BAXTER | Trustee | 19 June 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £134.01k | £170.63k | £104.40k | £134.29k | £122.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £171.66k | £155.81k | £154.13k | £199.74k | £247.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £27.27k | £13.61k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14 MAR 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05/09/2013
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR RACE, OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF CANTERBURY, KENT AND THE NEIGHBOURING TOWNS, VILLAGES AND NEIGHBOURHOOD (THE AREA OF BENEFIT) AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, IN PARTICULAR. 1. THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WITH MENTAL OR PHYSICAL SICKNESS, DISABILITY OR DISORDER; 2. THE RELIEF OF THE AGED; 3. THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF MENTAL AND EMOTIONAL HEALTH; 4. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Canterbury Umbrella
Canterbury Umbrella Centre
St. Peters Place
Canterbury
CT1 2DB
- Phone:
- 01227767660
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.