STRATFORD CHURCH OF CHRIST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our charity is involved in upholding the teachings of the Holy Bible. Hence we engage the general public in the study of the gospel that leads to salvation in accordance with the Bible. As a result of this, we help the needy, vulnerable, aged in the society and any genuine member of the society deserving of our support. We also respond to requests from victims of natural disasters internationally.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barking And Dagenham
- Newham
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 09 August 2013: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KWAKU TWUMASI | Chair | 28 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Ernest Tenkorang Danquah | Trustee | 04 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chikwado Opefi | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
EMMANUEL ADADE-BOATENG | Trustee | 28 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.46k | £48.39k | £44.65k | £71.98k | £72.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.53k | £27.96k | £27.19k | £31.74k | £39.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 November 2023 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 November 2023 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 May 2022 | 193 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 May 2022 | 193 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 May 2022 | 558 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 May 2022 | 558 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 09 Aug 2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. TO WORK WITH OTHER CHURCHES OF CHRIST LOCALLY AND INTERNATIONALLY TO PROMOTE THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Plymouth House
Keir Hardie Way
BARKING
Essex
IG11 9NB
- Phone:
- 07749056440
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window