THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST AND ST LUKE THE EVANGELIST, CLAY HILL, ENFIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides public worship open to all and sacred space for personal prayer & contemplation. Pastoral work includes visiting sick & bereaved. Teaches Christianity through sermons, courses & groups. Takes religious assemblies in church school. Promotes Christianity through events & meetings and the Church?s mission through activities for people of all ages. Supports other UK & overseas charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Enfield
Governance
- 27 March 2013: Previously excepted registration
- PCC OF ST JOHN & ST LUKE, CLAYHILL (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Mitzi James | Chair | 11 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOAN VERA YOUNG | Trustee | 05 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Anne Marie Tucker | Trustee | 05 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jeremy Michael Foot | Trustee | 07 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Doreen Addy | Trustee | 02 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Heather Muriel Ogilvy Livermore | Trustee | 02 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jack Williams | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marion Margaret Berry | Trustee | 06 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
PETER LIVERMORE | Trustee | 15 March 2015 |
|
|||||
Dr JOHN SIDNEY WRIGHT | Trustee | 24 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
PAUL BATES | Trustee | 24 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE ANN PLUMB | Trustee | 24 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHERYL GRAHAM | Trustee | 24 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARY LESLEY ENGLEFIELD | Trustee | 24 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
IAN JAMES BUSWELL | Trustee | 24 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL ANTHONY MANSFIELD | Trustee | 24 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £139.45k | £136.14k | £111.74k | £98.42k | £103.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £162.63k | £145.04k | £97.45k | £107.88k | £116.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £764 | N/A | £1.99k | £728 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02/01/1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
92 Browning Road
Enfield
EN2 0HG
- Phone:
- 020836366055
- Email:
- clayhillparish@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window