THE NEVILL HALL HOSPITAL THROMBOSIS AND GENERAL RESEARCH FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting research at Nevill Hall Hospital, Abergavenny, and service improvements for the benefit of patients within the hospital catchment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Monmouthshire
Governance
- 07 October 1974: Standard registration
- 22 August 2023: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 22 August 2023: Funds transferred to 1098728 ANEURIN BEVAN UNIVERSITY LOCAL HEALTH BOARD CHARIT...
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.41k | £9.28k | £9.21k | £5.35k | £1.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £133.07k | £76.14k | £61.97k | £55.28k | £182.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED ON 19 JUNE 1974 AS AMENDED 17 JULY 2007
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND EFFICIENCY OF THE NEVILL HALL HOSPITAL, ABERGAVENNY IN THE COUNTY OF GWENT (FORMERLY MOUNMOUTH) IN ITS WORK OF RELIEVING THE SICK.
Area of benefit
GWENT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window