THAMES VALLEY POSITIVE SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HIV sexual health and LGBTQIA plus charity operating in Berkshire and Hampshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £54,518 from 3 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bracknell Forest
- Hampshire
- Reading
- Slough
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 27 March 2013: Standard registration
- 16 February 2015: Funds received from 1022369 THAMES VALLEY POSITIVE SUPPORT
- TVPS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SEAN WHEELER | Chair | 26 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Terry Oliver Levi | Trustee | 28 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eilish Sorohan | Trustee | 12 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Lucas | Trustee | 27 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Michael Dawson | Trustee | 28 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Cardey | Trustee | 03 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin McEwen | Trustee | 16 January 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £227.67k | £183.80k | £190.56k | £208.87k | £159.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £237.36k | £246.72k | £194.56k | £222.92k | £206.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £79.24k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £79.86k | £58.50k | N/A | N/A | £54.52k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22 MAR 2012
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF ANY MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY EXPERIENCING ISSUES RELATED TO SEXUAL HEALTH, INCLUDING BY FOCUSING ON (I) WORKING IN THE FIELD OF SEXUAL HEALTH PROMOTION, HIV AND HEPATITIS PREVENTION AND SUPPORT; (II) PROVIDING SERVICES WHICH PROMOTE HEALTH AND WELL-BEING AND TO EMPOWER INDIVIDUALS, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, ADVICE, INFORMATION, ADVOCACY, RESOURCES, COUNSELLING, GROUP WORK, OUTREACH SERVICES, COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT SERVICES, CAPACITY BUILDING SERVICES. CAMPAIGNING, LEADERSHIP, ADVICE, RESEARCH, CLINICAL SERVICES, CONSTANCY SERVICES, TRAINING AND EDUCATION. AND SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THAMES VALLEY POSITIVE SUPPORT
629 BATH ROAD
SLOUGH
SL1 6AE
- Phone:
- 01628603400
- Email:
- office@tvps.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window