Colchester CMA Debt Centre

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of poverty through debt counselling, money advice, job clubs and other related activities in the Colchester, Essex area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 29 May 2013: CIO registration
- CCDC (Working name)
- CCDP (Previous name)
- COLCHESTER CAP DEBT CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Nicky Young | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Toby Bull | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Andrew Neill | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Sara Louise Batts-Neale | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Sian Helen Simpkins | Trustee | 21 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Andrew Roberts | Trustee | 19 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.92k | £57.84k | £62.18k | £46.93k | £34.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.40k | £41.91k | £58.15k | £61.52k | £51.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.00k | £10.83k | £17.99k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 29 MAY 2013 AMENDED ON 20/01/2015 as amended on 12 Dec 2023
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY FOR PERSONS IN ESSEX WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL AND/OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, BY PROVIDING SERVICES INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, DEBT COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT WITH FINDING EMPLOYMENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o The C3 Church
Ypres Road
COLCHESTER
CO2 7FD
- Phone:
- 07971308388
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window