Financial history ZION WAY MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1151391
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £23.59k £24.87k £36.50k £24.98k £40.16k
Total expenditure £17.80k £19.40k £28.01k £26.45k £30.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A