Trustees ASHBY DE LA ZOUCH AND DISTRICT AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY LTD
Charity Number: 1152908

Charity reporting is up to date (42 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT SCOTT DAVIES | Chair | 17 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Angus William Bennion | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Armson | Trustee | 24 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Claire Lorraine Anderson | Trustee | 24 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Martin Crane | Trustee | 25 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Louise Livesey | Trustee | 27 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN PETER GREENFIELD | Trustee | 27 March 2019 |
|
|||||
James Philip Alan Ludlam | Trustee | 21 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Andrew Hancock | Trustee | 26 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARTYN ADAMS | Trustee | 10 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
STUART JAMES WILSON | Trustee | 17 July 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.