COATS Crowthorne

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
COATS runs The COATS Centre in Crowthorne, Berkshire. It provides companionship, home cooked meals and stimulating activities for older people around the area and has a minibus to carry people from their own homes to the Centre. It is a continuation in CIO form of the original reg. charity The Crowthorne Old Age to Teen Society (COATS) no. 259897. All the assets have been transferred to the CIO.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income includes £750 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bracknell Forest
- Wokingham
Governance
- 06 June 2013: CIO registration
- 04 November 2017: Funds received from 259897 THE CROWTHORNE OLD AGE TO TEEN SOCIETY
- COATS (Working name)
- CROWTHORNE OLD AGE TO TEEN SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Rene Hutterli | Chair | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Claire Leane Dingley | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Briggs | Trustee | 24 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Derec Anthony Craig | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Richard Threlfall | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Wilson | Trustee | 21 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Roger Bruce Fox | Trustee | 11 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN MACALPINE RICKARDS | Trustee | 18 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £277.18k | £277.11k | £253.61k | £290.08k | £315.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £704.47k | £184.25k | £203.10k | £239.63k | £309.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £18.50k | £144.12k | £19.16k | N/A | £750 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 22 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 22 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 06 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 06 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 06 Jun 2013 as amended on 02 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF THE ELDERLY IN CROWTHORNE AND SURROUNDING AREA IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE
Contact information
- Address:
-
COATS Crowthorne
The C O A T S Centre
Pinewood Avenue
CROWTHORNE
RG45 6RQ
- Phone:
- 01344 773464
- Website:
-
coatscrowthorne.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window