THE WIKIRATE PROJECT UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support the operation of the website www.wikirate.org, through fundraising and network building.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of London
Governance
- 21 February 2014: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIPP HIRCHE | Chair | 03 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Regina Hirche | Trustee | 27 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Florian Hirche | Trustee | 07 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £150.00k | £100.01k | £21.81k | £73.72k | £162.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £99.00k | £151.00k | £13.46k | £80.68k | £160.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 May 2023 | 199 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 May 2023 | 199 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 December 2020 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 December 2020 | 32 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 21 Feb 2014
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ETHICAL STANDARDS OF CONDUCT AND COMPLIANCE WITH THE LAW BY COMMERCIAL ORGANISATIONS IN THEIR ADMINISTRATION AND MANAGEMENT, TREATMENT OF PERSONNEL, HEALTH SAFETY AND COMMERCIAL PRACTICES, IN PARTICULAR BY SUPPORTING THE OPERATION OF A WEBSITE BY THE WIKIRATE PROJECT E.V.
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 Dundonald Road
London
SW19 3QH
- Phone:
- 07449728395
- Email:
- info@wikirate.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window