THE TEMPSFORD MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trustees appealed for fund to meet the costs of the Tempsford Memorial, it installation, unveiling and future maintenance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 28 May 2013: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IMTIAZ HUSAIN FRCS | Chair | 24 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN GEORGE BESANT B EDS.HONS | Trustee | 24 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
BERNARD O'CONNOR | Trustee | 24 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN BEAGENT FCA | Trustee | 24 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH MARY INFIELD | Trustee | 24 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Anthony William Bingham | Trustee | 24 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
STEVE JOHN COONEY | Trustee | 24 April 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2014 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.28k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.88k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 06 February 2025 | 367 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 06 February 2025 | 732 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 06 February 2025 | 1097 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1546 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1546 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23/05/2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF TEMPSFORD MEMORIAL TRUST SHALL BE TO PROMOTE GOOD CITIZENSHIP AMONGST THE PUBLIC AND TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF THE ARMED FORCES OF THE CROWN BY PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING A PERMANENT PUBLIC MEMORIAL TO THE WOMEN VOLUNTEERS FOR SPECIAL OPERATIONS WHO MOSTLY LEFT FROM TEMPSFORD AIRFIELD TO BE DROPPED INTO OCCUPIED EUROPE, SOME OF WHOM LOST THEIR LIVES DURING THE SECOND WORLD WAR.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Church Barn
Mill Lane
Tempsford
Sandy
SG19 2AT
- Phone:
- 01767640697
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window