INTERNATIONAL GAY RUGBY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing opportunities for members of the LGBT to compete in rugby through tolerant and accepting clubs and teams, through community outreach, competitive play and tournament events that stand for tolerance and acceptance in sports; and working with the rugby governing bodies and other partner organisations worldwide to improve tolerance and acceptance of LGBT athletes at all levels of the sport.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Argentina
- Australia
- Belgium
- Canada
- Chile
- Denmark
- France
- Germany
- Greece
- Ireland
- Israel
- Italy
- Japan
- Mexico
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Northern Ireland
- Norway
- Portugal
- Scotland
- South Africa
- Spain
- Sweden
- United States
Governance
- 17 October 2013: CIO registration
- IGRAB (Working name)
- INTERNATIONAL GAY RUGBY ASSOCIATION AND BOARD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Eric Smith | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Quinton Leduc | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Rachel Lange Schnider | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Mark Edward Lewis | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|||||||
Ross Barr-Hoyland | Trustee | 16 August 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Maddison Paul Dennison | Trustee | 16 August 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Jeff Enochs | Trustee | 12 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/04/2020 | 06/04/2021 | 06/04/2022 | 06/04/2023 | 06/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.19k | £20.52k | £20.52k | £3.19k | £14.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.99k | £3.39k | £7.72k | £6.10k | £9.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 April 2024 | 04 March 2025 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2024 | 04 March 2025 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2022 | 06 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2022 | 08 June 2023 | 122 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2021 | 29 March 2022 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2021 | 29 March 2022 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2020 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2020 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 17 OCT 2013 AMENDED ON 25 MAY 2016 as amended on 15 Jun 2018 as amended on 06 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY IN PARTICULAR THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR IDENTIFICATION AND TO PROMOTE GOOD HEALTH THROUGH THE PLAYING OF RUGBY BOTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: -PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR MEMBERS OF THE LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL AND TRANSGENDER COMMUNITY ("LGBT")TO COMPETE IN RUGBY THROUGH TOLERANT AND ACCEPTING CLUBS AND TEAMS, BOTH PRIMARILY LGBT AND LGBT-FRIENDLY AND BY ELIMINATING HOMOPHOBIA IN RUGBY THROUGH COMMUNITY OUTREACH, COMPETITIVE PLAY AND TOURNAMENT EVENTS THAT STAND FOR TOLERANCE AND ACCEPTANCE IN SPORTS; AND -WORKING WITH THE RUGBY GOVERNING BODIES AND OTHER PARTNER ORGANISATIONS WORLDWIDE TO IMPROVE TOLERANCE AND ACCEPTANCE OF LGBT ATHLETES AT ALL LEVELS OF THE SPORT OF RUGBY ENSURING THAT NO INDIVIDUAL SHALL BE EXCLUDED FROM PARTICIPATING IN RUGBY ON THE BASIS OF SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR IDENTIFICATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
71 Holland Road
West Ham
London
E15 3BP
- Phone:
- 07964473063
- Email:
- mark.lewis@igrugby.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window