HAWCOAT COMMUNITY CENTRE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hawcoat Community Centre is for the use of the general public to hire, it also houses a Pre-School every morning during term time & also is used by several groups and societies such as a mother & toddler group, whist drives, Barrow Savoyaurds, keep fit classes, craft classes and activities, Barrow Townswomens Guild & a Friendship club. We also hold fundraising events for the charity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2021
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
- 23 September 2013: Standard registration
- HAWCOAT COMMUNITY CENTRE (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Mills | Chair | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Shaw | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alexandrea Tranter | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
HELEN RICE | Trustee | 28 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARY CLARKSON | Trustee | 20 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN SATTERTHWAITE | Trustee | 20 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.73k | £8.68k | £17.46k | £15.04k | £12.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.94k | £10.53k | £14.93k | £9.80k | £5.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 479 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 479 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 844 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 844 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 23 July 2022 | 168 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 16 March 2021 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 NOV 2012 AS AMENDED ON 30/08/2013
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF HAWCOAT, CUMBRIA AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Hardknott Gardens
Barrow-in-Furness
LA14 4NE
- Phone:
- 01229823280
- Email:
- ojnemo@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window