The Sparkle Academy

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote close co-operation and communication between parents, teachers and the community to study and discuss matters of mutual interest relating to the education and welfare of pupils to engage in activites which support and advance the education of pupils attending school and well being Our activities now include supporting the other schools
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
Governance
- 15 April 2013: Standard registration
- PORTHLEVEN SCHOOL ASSOCIATION OF FRIENDS (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Leigh Yates | Chair | 15 November 2013 |
|
|||||
Nick Dow | Trustee | 31 October 2022 |
|
|||||
David James Wyer | Trustee | 31 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £126.22k | £126.23k | £31.11k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £95.22k | £123.83k | £50.73k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 13 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 04 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 04 July 2023 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 04 July 2023 | 34 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 28 June 2023 | 393 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 28 June 2023 | 393 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 04 March 2023 | 642 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 04 March 2023 | 642 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 MAR 2013 AS AMENDED ON 09 JUL 2019 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 29 AUG 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL AND HELSTON COMMUNITY COLLEGE IN PARTICULAR BY: 1) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOLS AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.?
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 St. Peters Way
Porthleven
HELSTON
TR13 9AY
- Phone:
- 01326554288
- Email:
- leighyates@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window