LEGACY EAST ALMSHOUSE PARTNERSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Management of almshouse charities, management of almshouses and engagment in the provision of new almshouses for people in need of housing. At the present time, the areas in which we can operate are Essex, Suffolk and Norfolk.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
- Suffolk
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- LEAP (Working name)
- LEGACY EAST ALMSHOUSE CHARITY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK WESTALL | Trustee | 08 April 2025 |
|
|||||||||
Christopher Andrews | Trustee | 08 April 2025 |
|
|||||||||
Robert Neve | Trustee | 08 April 2025 |
|
|||||||||
Peter Martin Hill | Trustee | 08 April 2025 |
|
|||||||||
Adam Edwards | Trustee | 08 April 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
DIANA Elizabeth HOY | Trustee | 08 April 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Manda O'Connell | Trustee | 08 April 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
IAN DUDLEY | Trustee | 08 April 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Kevin Dale | Trustee | 08 April 2025 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.81k | £301.22k | £351.25k | £401.77k | £450.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.71k | £226.54k | £251.13k | £179.93k | £222.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 March 2022 | 150 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 March 2022 | 150 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 06 Feb 2014
Charitable objects
1) TO ACQUIRE, MANAGE, MAINTAIN AND DEVELOP ALMSHOUSES AND OTHER CHARITABLE TRUST PROPERTY FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE IN NEED OF HOUSING; 2) SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AT THE TRUSTEES' ABSOLUTE DISCRETION WHICH MAY BE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE PURPOSES, THE CIO MAY TAKE OVER AND MANAGE ESTABLISHED PERMANENT ENDOWMENTS IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ORIGINAL OBJECTS OF THE TRUSTS RELATING TO EACH PERMANENT ENDOWMENT.
Linked charities
- ALMSHOUSES IN CHURCH STREET
- BADDOW ROAD ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
- BRIGHTLINGSEA SANTIAGO ALMSHOUSE
- CHARITY OF JANET DOWSETT
- CHELMSFORD ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
- COPLAND ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
- DAME ALICE ROWE
- DR WEST MEMORIAL HOME
- ELIZABETH WARNER COTTAGE
- HODDESDON COTTAGE HOMES FOR THE AGED POOR
- JOHN GILDERS & MASKELL ALMSHOUSES CHARITY
- LOUGHTON ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
- MARY DAINS COTTAGES
- MATTHEW JOYCE
- MISS RUTLAND'S ALMSHOUSES
- NETHANIAH HOME
- PRISCILLA MANSERS FUND
- QUEEN ELISABETH'S CHARITY
- SARAH ANNIE BOND
- SARAH ELIZA HURRELL LIVERMORE
- SARAH NASH
- SIR WILLIAM PETRE'S ALMSHOUSES AND CHAPEL
- SPRINGFIELD GREEN ALMSHOUSES
- SPROWSTON WAR MEMORIAL TRUST
- THE (CHELMSFORD) UNITED CHARITIES
- THE ERNEST ELIJAH EVERITT TRUST
- THE FULLER ALMSHOUSES
- THOMAS MILDMAY FOR ALMSPEOPLE AND THE POOR
- WILLIAM DAVEY AND OTHERS
- WILLIAM WILLIAMS
- WRITTLE ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
- 22 September 1962 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Newbridge Hill
West Bergholt
COLCHESTER
CO6 3ER
- Phone:
- 07803908686
- Email:
- clerk@leapalmshouses.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window