RUBY'S FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A fully inclusive sensory centre & social cafe for children & young people with disabilities & additional needs. The centre with social cafe offers a safe, stimulating environment, giving individuals, families, carers & groups chance to explore & develop. Ideal for therapy, relaxation, education, friendship & fun. It provides a sensory room, soft play, groups, sessions & support groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
Total income includes £29,114 from 2 government contract(s) and £9,518 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire East
Governance
- 22 May 2013: Standard registration
- 02 January 2014: Funds received from 1129503 RUBY'S FUND
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Mark Pear | Chair | 30 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Brown | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carol Baniff | Trustee | 27 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Farr Mrs | Trustee | 30 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Swindells | Trustee | 08 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Stewart | Trustee | 07 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Lewis | Trustee | 07 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £281.69k | £392.09k | £432.80k | £487.12k | £326.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £186.86k | £232.46k | £339.43k | £402.19k | £396.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £11.20k | £12.40k | £86.10k | £147.60k | £29.11k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £86.10k | £25.16k | N/A | £9.52k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 27 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 27 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 MAR 2013
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE RECREATIONAL, EDUCATIONAL AND LEISURE FACILITIES FOR (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) INDIVIDUALS OF ALL AGES WITH ADDITIONAL PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND/OR SOCIAL NEEDS INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) PROVIDING A MULTISENSORY STUDIO, SOFT PLAY FACILITY AREA, EDUCATIONAL CLASSES, RESPITE AND SOCIAL SUPPORT GROUP AFFORDED BY WAY OF FUNDRAISING THROUGH VARIOUS METHODS INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THE DESIGN, MANUFACTURE AND SALE OF PRODUCTS AND THE OPERATION OF A CAFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Meridian House
Roe Street
CONGLETON
CW12 1PG
- Phone:
- 01260277666
- Email:
- info@rubysfund.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window