Financial history WRESSLE VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 503668
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.89k £21.54k £4.09k £5.33k £6.65k
Total expenditure £3.20k £4.70k £4.32k £2.85k £6.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.43k N/A N/A N/A