Financial history THE PINCHBECK CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1152723
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 11/06/2020 11/06/2021 11/06/2022 11/06/2023 11/06/2024
Total gross income £121.21k £2.00k £0 £0 £2.86k
Total expenditure £132.46k £56.69k £875.55k £32.50k £21.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A