Financial history ENGLISH BRIDGE EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT

Charity number: 1153543
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £313.30k £99.51k £159.19k £220.18k £764.26k
Total expenditure £318.59k £192.67k £176.11k £191.13k £216.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £563.42k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £19.68k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £175.30k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £5.73k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £125
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £525.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £216.93k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £6.26k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0