Financial history SURREY 4X4 RESPONSE

Charity number: 1152110
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £9.71k £17.07k £5.60k £12.13k £17.48k
Total expenditure £27.05k £11.17k £13.26k £11.01k £11.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A