EDEN NETWORK MERSEYSIDE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educating young people within socially and economically disadvantaged communities Advance and demonstrate the Christian Faith Relieve poverty and sickness and promote and protect good health of people Develop the capacity and skills of the residents Promote social inclusion for the public benefit Promote such other charitable purposes in such a way as the trustees shall think fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Wirral
Governance
- 08 July 2013: CIO registration
- EDEN MERSEYSIDE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas James Grant | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Allan Finnegan | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
THE MESSAGE TRUST | Trustee | 04 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.85k | £1.85k | £1.85k | £1.55k | £1.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £585 | £732 | £124 | £95 | £83 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 March 2024 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 March 2024 | 33 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 February 2023 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 February 2023 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 February 2021 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 February 2021 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 08 Jul 2013
Charitable objects
1. EDUCATION TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING WITHIN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES OF MERSEYSIDE (THE AREA OF BENEFIT). 2. YOUNG PEOPLE TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY. 3. RELIGION TO ADVANCE, COMMUNICATE, EXPLAIN AND DEMONSTRATE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH. 4. POVERTY TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND PROMOTE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH OF PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. 5. COMMUNITY CAPACITY BUILDING TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE RESIDENTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY. 6. PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY* *FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ?SOCIALLY EXCLUDED? MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY). 7. OTHER TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN SUCH A WAY AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/o The Message Trust
Lancaster House
Harper Road
Sharston Industrial Area
MANCHESTER
M22 4RG
- Phone:
- 0161 946 2300
- Email:
- samw@eden-network.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window