AFRICAN CARRIBBEAN DENTAL ASSOCIATION UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of the Association is the promotion, preservation and protection of oral health amongst ethnic minority groups, especially within the African and Caribbean communities in the UK, and the world at large.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
- Medway
- Surrey
- Throughout London
Governance
- 15 May 2014: Standard registration
- UK ACDA (Working name)
- UK AFRICAN AND CARRIBBEAN DENTAL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kavin Andi | Trustee | 02 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Olurotimi Adesanya | Trustee | 23 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.18k | £12.92k | £12.57k | £6.53k | £10.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.05k | £9.91k | £8.51k | £12.32k | £10.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 16 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 24 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 25 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 27 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/09/2013
Charitable objects
(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION PARTICULARLY AMONGST YOUNG PEOPLE TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPACITY AND SKILLS ENABLING THEM TO PARTICIPATE FULLY IN SOCIETY. (2) THE PROMOTION, PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AND WELLBEING IN GENERAL AND DENTAL HEALTH IN PARTICULAR. (3) THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WITH A PARTICULAR FOCUS ON HEALTH AND WELLBEING AND WITH A VIEW TO ADDRESSING HEALTH INEQUALITIES. (4) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17a New Road Avenue
Chatham
ME4 6BA
- Phone:
- 08450 509687
- Email:
- info@acda-uk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window