MIDDLEWICH AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
the Charity is established to maintain and administer the Middlewich Community Centre for the benifit of local inhabitants. Its aim is to provide first class accommodation and facilities at an affordable cost for organisations and individuals serving the community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 18 November 1974: Standard registration
- M D C A (Working name)
- MDCA (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EMMA jane newton HIGGIN | Chair | 30 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.31k | £12.27k | £5.57k | £8.94k | £8.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.04k | £5.47k | £11.10k | £400 | £7.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 APRIL 1973
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF MIDDLEWICH AND NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATIONA AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. B) TO ESTABLISH A COMMUNITY CENTRE - FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CONSTITUTION.
Area of benefit
MIDDLEWICH AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
54 Long Lane
MIDDLEWICH
Cheshire
CW10 0EL
- Phone:
- 07837550020
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window