Financial history GREATER THINGS (RUGBY)

Charity number: 1152542
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £62.04k £60.19k £49.58k £52.53k £50.15k
Total expenditure £62.56k £44.09k £54.45k £52.17k £51.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A