THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD, HOUSE OF PRAISE KIDBROOKE

Charity number: 1151492
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The principal activity of thecharity are worship and Propagation of Christain Tenets and alleviation of pverty

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £49,928
Total expenditure: £47,180

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Greenwich

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 April 2013: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • RCCG HOUSE OF PRAISE KIDBROOKE (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PASTOR ADEBAYO GEORGE-LAWAL Chair 11 May 2022
SIMNET OUTREACH MINISTRIES
Received: On time
IREDELE OLUWASEGUN OYEDELE Trustee 11 May 2022
THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD - RIVERS OF LIVING WATER
Received: On time
REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD (RCCG) MERCY CHAPEL
Recently registered
AYOLA MERCY ABARI Trustee 02 April 2013
None on record
OLESEGUN OBALOLU ADEKOLA Trustee 02 April 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £37.19k £30.23k £32.64k £38.37k £49.93k
Total expenditure £32.56k £20.78k £26.04k £41.16k £47.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 13 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 13 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 26 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 12 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
4 MERBURY ROAD
LONDON
SE28 0HR
Phone:
07702315587