WESTBOURNE HALL COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide welcoming,safe environment for the community, reflecting local needs and aspirations; contribute to health and well-being of all ages and abilities; develop premises and facilities;work co-operatively with local partners and affiliated groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wirral
Governance
- 17 April 2013: Standard registration
- 21 May 2014: Funds received from 1064384 THE WESTBOURNE COMMUNITY CENTRE
- WESTBOURNE HALL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gareth Andrew Jones | Chair | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Kim Aspinall | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Ann Brookshaw | Trustee | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roger William Carter | Trustee | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Jackson | Trustee | 26 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Simon James EVANS | Trustee | 22 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER ANN MORLEY | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
CYNTHIA ECCLES | Trustee | 24 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID RICHARD WADE | Trustee | 12 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.09k | £42.75k | £36.31k | £39.20k | £49.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.03k | £41.07k | £51.37k | £51.33k | £52.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.85k | £41.30k | £12.82k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 03 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 03 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 13 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 13 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 01 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 01 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 13 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 13 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19/03/2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF WEST KIRBY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD AND OTHER DISTRICTS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DEEM APPROPRIATE, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE, OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Westbourne Hall Community Centre
59 Westbourne Road
West Kirby
WIRRAL
CH48 4DQ
- Phone:
- 07749724502
- Email:
- westbournehall@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window