THE BANBURY MUSEUM TRUST

Charity number: 1153109
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Banbury Museum is a purpose built museum, which displays historic collections relating to North Oxfordshire and beyond, and temporary exhibitions. The Museum engages a broad audience through an extensive programme of educational activities and also engages in historical research of both activities and collections. It offers professional museum advice to other museums and heritage projects.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Buckinghamshire
  • Gloucestershire
  • Northamptonshire
  • Oxfordshire
  • Warwickshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 July 2013: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rebecca Mileham Chair 21 November 2018
None on record
Rob Pattenden Trustee 25 June 2024
None on record
Jonathan Mark Walton Trustee 29 March 2023
TOOLEY'S BOATYARD TRUST
Received: On time
Shaida Hussain Trustee 10 March 2021
None on record
Clare Adams Trustee 09 March 2020
The Warwickshire Music Education Trust
Received: On time
Alastair Scott Trustee 08 November 2016
None on record
ALEXANDRA WILLIAMS Trustee 13 July 2015
None on record
Dr Helen Forde Trustee 20 November 2013
BANBURY HISTORICAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
MARC FITCH FUND
Received: On time
JOHN ERNEST SPRATT Trustee 04 April 2013
TOOLEY'S BOATYARD TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £598.80k £660.35k £616.50k £650.15k £649.99k
Total expenditure £674.12k £518.36k £778.00k £657.68k £640.09k
Income from government contracts £10.00k £10.00k £10.00k £10.00k N/A
Income from government grants £359.10k £451.63k £389.61k £378.52k £392.66k
Income - Donations and legacies £43.36k £1.33k £1.35k £79.25k £44.93k
Income - Other trading activities £109.94k £46.41k £92.58k £122.99k £138.82k
Income - Charitable activities £445.41k £612.54k £522.56k £447.54k £462.42k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £85 £61 £13 £377 £3.82k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £586.88k £477.84k £693.27k £548.29k £512.67k
Expenditure - Raising funds £87.24k £40.52k £84.73k £109.38k £127.41k
Expenditure - Governance £1.92k £1.37k £6.00k £6.07k £2.65k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £57.34k £50.62k £37.20k £30.66k £24.13k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £280.57k £380.65k £335.16k £282.94k £327.79k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£75.00k -£339.00k -£153.00k £0 £0
Total liabilities £239.47k £152.84k £188.44k £74.20k £94.62k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 23 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 23 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 25 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 25 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 16 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 August 2022 211 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 30 August 2022 211 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 August 2022 576 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 24 August 2022 570 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Banbury Museum
Castle Quay
Spiceball Park Road
BANBURY
OX16 2PQ
Phone:
01295753781