FAMILY LIFE CHRISTIAN CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To passionately build a governing Church to influence the city and impact the nation, through the raising of worshipful covenantal breakthrough believers trained in kingdom living, manifesting Christ?s character in ministry with miracles, signs and wonders finishing His will on the earth.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ghana
Governance
- 16 July 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev NANA KOBINA BANYIN | Chair | 08 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Rev CHARLES GODMAN WESLEY | Trustee | 08 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Rev JAMES KWESI ENNIN | Trustee | 08 May 2013 |
|
|||||
WILHELMINA ABBAN-MENSAH | Trustee | 08 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £255.33k | £283.44k | £279.25k | £194.33k | £112.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £246.52k | £200.67k | £237.13k | £197.08k | £94.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 March 2025 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 March 2025 | 46 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 March 2025 | 411 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 March 2025 | 411 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 May 2023 | 92 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 May 2023 | 92 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION DATED 21 FEB 2019
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE PROCLAMATION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE GOSPEL OF GOD. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN EDUCATION AND TRAINING RELIEF FROM POVERTY AND DISTRESS
Contact information
- Address:
-
FAMILY LIFE CHRISTIAN CENTRE
THE HOUSE OF FAVOUR
454-460 OLD KENT ROAD
LONDON
SE1 5AG
- Phone:
- 02070646888
- Email:
- admin@flccuk.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window