VIBRANCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Vibrance provides Supported Living, Registered Care Homes (with and without nursing), Brokerage, Outreach, Community Day Services, Short Breaks and Personal Budget Support i.e. Fundholding, Payroll, Support Planning and PA Registers in 12 local authorities providing services to around 350 people in our directly provided services and a further 1400 in our Self Directed Services
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Total income:
£15,321,745
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £15.25m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £71.15k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£15,321,745
Raising funds | £106.69k | |
Charitable activities | £15.22m | |
Other | £0 |
£71,712 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £13,089,796 from 15 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £106.69k | |
Charitable expenditure | £15.22m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £106.69k | |
Charitable expenditure | £15.22m | |
Retained for future use | £71.71k |
People

600 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 5 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bexley
- Bromley
- Essex
- Merton
- Newham
- Redbridge
- Southend-on-sea
- Tower Hamlets
- Waltham Forest
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 24 May 2013: Standard registration
- REDBRIDGE COMMUNITY HOUSING LTD (Working name)
- VIBRANCE (Working name)
- RCHL (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Lyons | Chair | 03 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Jane Wiggins | Trustee | 27 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jill Lecznar | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Mark Barnes | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ryan Amman Lever | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Binnie Goh | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Evonne Powell | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adil Ghani | Trustee | 04 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Margaret Richardson | Trustee | 31 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL GEORGE ATKINS | Trustee | 24 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
PAUL ALLEN | Trustee | 06 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.69m | £15.60m | £14.29m | £13.93m | £14.89m | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.65m | £14.65m | £14.57m | £14.41m | £15.32m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £11.58m | £14.50m | £13.99m | £13.44m | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £242.85k | £407.54k | £13.09m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £43.71k | £986.80k | £5.43k | £3.64k | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £52.55k | £43.11k | £59.04k | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £11.58m | £14.52m | £14.23m | £13.85m | £15.25m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £22.95k | £38.51k | £13.14k | £14.81k | £71.15k | |
|
Income - Other | £44.38k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £11.51m | £14.54m | £14.47m | £14.29m | £15.22m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £134.72k | £117.03k | £105.79k | £111.49k | £106.69k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £175.65k | £185.48k | £230.82k | £89.59k | £207.05k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £5.85k | £5.71k | £2.50k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £490.08k | £466.12k | £426.96k | £309.71k | £361.06k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £846.74k | £968.38k | £985.63k | £926.88k | |
|
Other assets | £3.38m | £5.01m | £4.01m | £6.27m | £8.81m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£2.57m | -£1.49m | -£1.99m | -£1.49m | -£493.42k | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.20m | £2.55m | £2.10m | £5.04m | £8.44m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 June 2024 | 132 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 June 2024 | 132 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 June 2023 | 148 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 July 2023 | 176 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2023 | 364 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2023 | 364 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 December 2022 | 681 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 December 2022 | 681 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28 MAR 2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 05/07/2013 as amended on 25 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
TO CARRY ON FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY: 3.1 THE BUSINESS OF (A) PROVIDING AND MANAGING HOUSING AND ASSOCIATED FACILITIES AND AMENITIES FOR AND (B) PROVIDING SERVICES TO PEOPLE WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE INCLUDING PEOPLE WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY, PEOPLE WITH MENTAL HEALTH NEEDS, THE FRAIL ELDERLY AND OTHER PEOPLE WHO HAVE SUPPORT NEEDS; AND 3.2 ANY OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECT WHICH MAY SEEM TO THE TRUSTEES CAPABLE OF BEING CONVENIENTLY CARRIED OUT IN CONNECTION WITH THE ABOVE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Vibrance
The Green House
244-254 Cambridge Heath Road
Bethnal Green
London
E2 9DA
- Phone:
- 02084771800
- Email:
- info@vibrance.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window