WOODGRANGE BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1151805
Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Pastoral support and advocacy Sunday worship Home-based Bible Study and support groups Prayer meetings Various activities for youth Baby & Toddler Groups Women's Health Clubs Foodbank Lunch Club & Drop-in

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023

Total income: £135,707
Total expenditure: £148,942

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Newham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 April 2013: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Timothy John West Chair 23 May 2022
WOODGRANGE BAPTIST CHURCH CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Tanya Noah Trustee 04 June 2023
None on record
Arash Kherad Kish Trustee 04 June 2023
None on record
Matthew Ceaser Trustee 04 June 2023
None on record
Sonia Smith Trustee 19 June 2022
None on record
Esther Faibil Trustee 20 June 2021
None on record
Cynthia Gowdie Trustee 20 June 2021
None on record
Eileen Lorna Giddings Trustee 02 June 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £227.92k £194.24k £136.29k £159.84k £135.71k
Total expenditure £157.76k £185.01k £150.39k £142.78k £148.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £250 £250 £7.06k £8.55k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 20 February 2025 386 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 20 February 2025 386 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 18 July 2023 168 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 18 July 2023 168 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 February 2022 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 07 February 2022 7 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 March 2021 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 03 March 2021 31 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
345 Romford Road
Forest Gate
London
E7 8AA
Phone:
07708682464