GRACE CHURCH HIGHLANDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grace Church Highlands is a Church of England 'Mission Initiative'. Our aim is to serve Christ and to share Christ. We meet for a service every Sunday at 10.30am in Highlands School; during the service we run a creche and groups for children aged up to 14. We organise a range of other activities for Church members, guests and for the people of Highlands village.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
99 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Enfield
Governance
- 11 July 2013: CIO registration
- GCH (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Jonathan Bell | Chair | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Heidi Bennett | Trustee | 10 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ares Kokkinos | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marie Haines | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emily Florence Hammer | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Timothy David Catt | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sheamal Samarasekera | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Mason | Trustee | 01 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
JEFFREY ROBERT HAMMER | Trustee | 26 April 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £114.85k | £92.85k | £99.70k | £105.60k | £121.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £83.31k | £80.69k | £103.66k | £120.78k | £158.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 11 Jul 2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, BY SERVING AND REACHING FOR CHRIST, THE COMMUNITY OF HIGHLANDS VILLAGE, AND WIDER NETWORKS OF PEOPLE CONNECTED WITH MEMBERS OF THE CONGREGATION, BY, IN PARTICULAR, HOLDING SERVICES OF WORSHIP, PROMOTING STUDY OF THE BIBLE, MISSIONARY AND OUTREACH WORK
Area of benefit
ENFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 The Fairway
London
N14 4NY
- Phone:
- 02083648462
- Email:
- pandrdownie@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window