Financial history AUTISM AWARE UK

Charity Number: 1154287
Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £37.87k £11.54k £22.32k £26.68k £32.31k
Total expenditure £26.81k £10.95k £3.59k £5.93k £27.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A