THE BOYS' BRIGADE (WEST MIDLAND DISTRICT)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We act as a link between all the Companies and Battalions in our area and the Boys' Brigade National Headquarters. We also provide camping facilities at our Camping Centre in Dyffryn Ardudwy, Wales. We are also responsible for the National Boys' Brigade Memorial garden at the National Memorial Arboretum at Alrewas, Staffordshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Shropshire
- Staffordshire
- Wolverhampton
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 09 January 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MALCOLM PAUL WATCHORN | Chair |
|
||||||
John Anthony Sharp | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Antony Winwood | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
JOHN HODDINOTT | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.66k | £30.42k | £3.02k | £31.52k | £57.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £73.91k | £22.72k | £18.00k | £17.07k | £45.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31/05/1919 AS AMENDED ON 27/04/1998 AS AMENDED ON 06/05/2010
Charitable objects
THE DISTRICT COUNCIL SHALL ACT TO PROMOTE THE INTERESTS OF THE BRIGADE IN ITS DISTRICT BY ORGANISING ACTIVITIES FOR ITS MEMBERS; BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, TRAINING AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR FELLOWSHIP FOR LEADERS; AND BY SEEKING OPPORTUNITIES FOR DEVELOPMENT OF THE BRIGADE TO FULFIL ITS OBJECT
Area of benefit
WEST MIDLANDS DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
158 Droitwich Road
Fernhill Heath
WORCESTER
WR3 7UA
- Phone:
- 07763903700
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window