CATCH LEEDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community and youth provision, providing recreational and development opportunities for young people and the community. Bonfire Period Diversionary Activities ? Football and Roller Disco as a positive alternative to anti-social behaviour. Ramadan Diversionary Activities ? again, a compelling alternative to anti-social behaviour.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £31,748 from 5 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
121 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leeds City
Governance
- 01 October 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Short | Chair | 21 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Buck | Trustee | 21 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Louise Hamilton | Trustee | 21 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jean Clennell | Trustee | 21 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rod Barnes | Trustee | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rob Bumby | Trustee | 18 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Hallam | Trustee | 18 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rebekah Elizabeth Besford | Trustee | 16 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS MARTIN BALL | Trustee | 08 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £203.25k | £247.38k | £528.34k | £389.44k | £228.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £139.45k | £214.65k | £388.20k | £291.26k | £253.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £13.72k | £104.84k | £199.67k | £108.95k | £31.75k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £203.82k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £42.47k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £61.88k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £388.20k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £1.63k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION CONVERSION 08 APR 2021
Charitable objects
1.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: (1) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE, RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN LEEDS THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; AND BY (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. (2) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY WORKING WITH PEOPLE IN LEEDS WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, AGE OR GENDER AND TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. (3) TO PROMOTE THE PREVENTION OF CRIME AND PUBLIC SAFETY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN LEEDS IN PARTNERSHIP WITH THE POLICE AND RELEVANT STATUTORY AUTHORITIES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO SUPPORTING MEASURES, PROGRAMMES AND PROJECTS THAT PREVENT AND PROTECT PEOPLE AND PROPERTY FROM CRIMINAL ACTS AND ANTI SOCIAL BEHAVIOUR WITH THE AIM OF BUILDING BRIDGES BETWEEN THE COMMUNITY AND THE POLICE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ark
Hovingham Avenue
LEEDS
LS8 3QY
- Phone:
- 0113 235 0614
- Email:
- CATCH@arkleeds.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window