OFF THE RECORD (TWICKENHAM)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Off The Record Twickenham (OTR) provides counselling, supported information and sexual health services to young people aged 11 to 24 who live, work, or study in the borough of Richmond upon Thames.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £29,520 from 1 government contract(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Richmond Upon Thames
Governance
- 20 May 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jocelyn Wendy Mooney | Trustee | 25 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Phil Woodford | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Fearn | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Stewart | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Haynes | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Holt | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rajesh Bakrania | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte West | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Christopher Whistler | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Lewis Jenkins | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Rebecca McCarthy | Trustee | 02 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £197.16k | £288.24k | £234.49k | £276.58k | £212.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £204.89k | £199.85k | £256.87k | £286.48k | £315.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £29.00k | £29.00k | £29.00k | £116.00k | £29.52k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28 MAR 2013 as amended on 14 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
(1)THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS OF YOUNG PERSONS (BEING PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25) IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, PARTICULARLY THE LONDON BOROUGH OF RICHMOND UPON THAMES. (2)THE RELIEF AND PREVENTION OF SUFFERING CAUSED BY MENTAL OR PHYSICAL ILL HEALTH OR BY SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES AMONG YOUNG PEOPLE BY ESTABLISHING, MAINTAINING AND DEVELOPING A COUNSELLING SERVICE FOR THE GIVING OF INDIVIDUAL OR GROUP COUNSELLING, AND PRACTICAL ADVICE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 CHURCH STREET
TWICKENHAM
TW1 3NJ
- Phone:
- 02087441644
- Email:
- info@otrtwickenham.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window