OPERAUPCLOSE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OperaUpClose is a small, ambitious Olivier Award-winning touring opera company producing innovatively staged, unintimidating, affordable and high-quality English chamber re-imaginings of well-known works and premieres of new operas. Our mission is to show opera is a vibrant, living art-form for everyone to enjoy and be inspired by, regardless of gender, ethnicity, background and economic means.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- Scotland
Governance
- 08 August 2013: Standard registration
- UP CLOSE PRODUCTIONS (Previous name)
- UPCLOSE PRODUCTIONS LONDON (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hazel Province | Trustee | 16 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Clare Williams | Trustee | 11 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Ward | Trustee | 11 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Andrews | Trustee | 11 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Lyons | Trustee | 11 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
CHARITH JEEVAKA LESLIE CABRAAL | Trustee | 02 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Helen Ariss OBE | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|||||
Joe McFadden | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £476.36k | £254.69k | £187.41k | £250.34k | £454.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £444.25k | £148.47k | £173.21k | £205.72k | £461.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £97.83k | £43.80k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/07/2013 as amended on 04 Aug 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS, PARTICULARLY THE ARTS OF OPERA, THEATRE AND DANCE, BY THE PRODUCTION OF OPERA, THEATRE AND DANCE BOTH IN THE UK AND INTERNATIONALLY, PARTICULARLY WITH THE INTENTION OF ATTRACTING NEW AUDIENCES TO THOSE ART FORMS BY PROVIDING HIGH QUALITY PRODUCTIONS AT AFFORDABLE PRICES, AND OF PROVIDING TRAINING OPPORTUNITIES FOR EMERGING ARTISTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MAST Mayflower Studios
142-144 Above Bar St
Southampton
SO14 7DU
- Phone:
- 02382 547320
- Email:
- info@operaupclose.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window