Financial history Hounslow Community Rowing Trust

Charity number: 1151845
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £35.07k £24.41k £25.56k £34.37k £11.97k
Total expenditure £59.44k £15.00k £26.66k £29.70k £21.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £4.71k N/A