BRODETSKY JEWISH PRIMARY SCHOOL FOUNDATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity is the Foundation Trust for the Brodetsky Primary School and has granted tenancy rights to the Leeds Jewish Free School and the Zone. In its capacity as the Foundation Trust for the Brodetsky Primary School, the charity received donations being land and buildings previously owned by Leeds City Council and the Scopus Jewish Educational Trust.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Leeds City
Governance
- 24 April 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LISA BAKER | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Henry Michael Cohen | Trustee | 08 June 2015 |
|
|||||
DR JASON IAN BROCH | Trustee | 02 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL ANDREW COHEN | Trustee | 19 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
JASON MARK KLEIMAN | Trustee | 19 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.80k | £9.25k | £10.15k | £12.21k | £1.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.20k | £53.65k | £54.55k | £56.61k | £1.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 25 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 08 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 02 December 2023 | 155 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 02 October 2022 | 94 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 17 March 2022 | 260 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18 FEB 2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 3.1 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, THE EDUCATION OF STUDENTS AT ANY SCHOOL (INCLUDING ANY QUALIFYING SCHOOL) WITH A DESIGNATED ORTHODOX JEWISH CHARACTER AND ETHOS. 3.2 TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF LEEDS AND THE SURROUNDING AREA OF WEST YORKSHIRE, FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. 3.3 TO ADVANCE THE JEWISH FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ORTHODOX JEWISH CHARACTER AND ETHOS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Brodetsky Primary School
The Henry Cohen Campus
Wentworth Avenue
Leeds
LS17 7TN
- Phone:
- 07533351001
- Email:
- info@brodetsky.leeds.sch.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window