Accounts and annual returns SUTCLIFF BAPTIST CHURCH, OLNEY

Charity number: 1151773
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 06 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 06 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 29 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 29 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 06 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 06 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 25 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window