LITTLE MISS GEEK ACADEMY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 May 2013: Standard registration
- 09 October 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2014 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09 APR 2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY WHICH ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: (1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC. WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FORGOING IN PARTICULAR TO ADDRESS THE UNDER REPRESENTATION OF YOUNG WOMEN IN THE AREAS OF SCIENCE, TECHNOLOGY, ENGINEERING AND MATHS BY ENCOURAGING SUCH YOUNG WOMEN TO IDENTIFY THE BARRIERS TO THEIR PARTICIPATION IN THESE SUBJECTS GENERALLY AND TO LEARN ABOUT THESE SUBJECTS AND DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS SO THAT THEY MAY REACH THEIR FULL POTENTIAL; (2) ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE WHICH SHALL BE SELECTED BY THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window