PARENT, TEACHER AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION OF BLACKHEATH PREPARATORY SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Parent Teachers & Friends Association who raise funds to support our school by providing equipment and facilities above and beyond the core educational expenditure. We raise funds through a variety of social events involving all members of the school community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Greenwich
Governance
- 11 July 2013: Standard registration
- BLACKHEATH PREP PTFA (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicolo Ferrari | Chair | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Zhenyan Tang | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Damien Orban | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
SHAREEN MORGAN | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebekah Orban | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Yashika Lamahewa | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
SUZANNAH DUGGAN | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pat Fraser | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nadine Khawaja | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lakhvir Grewal | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Lisa McBride | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE de GROOT | Trustee | 28 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
SARAH BRAIN | Trustee | 02 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.30k | £22.85k | £6.69k | £16.91k | £16.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.77k | £26.20k | £5.77k | £8.26k | £11.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 01 July 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 01 July 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 01 July 2020 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 MAR 2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 1) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Blackheath Prep
4 St. Germans Place
LONDON
SE3 0NJ
- Phone:
- 02088580692
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window