GHANA NURSES ASSOCIATION (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We engage in health promotion among the Ghanaian and other minority ethnic communities in London and surrounding areas. We also promote education and health in Ghana by supplying medical equipment and helping build and stock libraries for villages and small towns.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Ghana
Governance
- 25 June 2013: Standard registration
- GNA (UK) (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doris Begah | Trustee | 27 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Hackman | Trustee | 27 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Henrietta Korang | Trustee | 27 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Evelyn Asiam | Trustee | 27 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Alfonso-Brown | Trustee | 27 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Selina Willis | Trustee | 27 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Florence Eghan | Trustee | 27 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gloria Lamptey | Trustee | 27 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Linda de Graft-Johnson | Trustee | 17 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lina Addo-Yobo | Trustee | 17 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £165.13k | £83.85k | £110.55k | £102.60k | £179.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £126.19k | £55.91k | £56.73k | £114.66k | £167.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 February 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 February 2024 | 104 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION CONVERSION DATED 19 OCT 2021
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, AMONG GHANAIANS LIVING IN THE UK AND GHANA 2.THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, AMONG GHANAIANS LIVING IN THE UK AND GHANA 3.THE RELIEF OF THOSE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, GHANAIANS LIVING IN THE UK AND GHANA, WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY,FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE.4.THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, AMONG GHANAIANS LIVING IN THE UK AND GHANA.
Area of benefit
UK AND GHANA
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 CHARCROFT GARDENS
ENFIELD
EN3 7HA
- Phone:
- 02088055485
- Email:
- info@gna-uk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window