YSGOL TREMEIRCHION PTA

Charity number: 1151799
Charity reporting is overdue by 257 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To support the school and pupils to provide resources or experiences that are in addition to that provided by the school.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 26 October 2022

Total income: £4,042
Total expenditure: £2,203

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Denbighshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 April 2013: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • YSGOL TREMEIRCHION CYMDEITHAS RHIENI AC ARTHRAWON (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PETER BULLEN Chair 25 April 2013
None on record
EMMA LIGHTBOWN BSC HONS Trustee 25 April 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 26/10/2018 26/10/2019 26/10/2020 26/10/2021 26/10/2022
Total gross income £4.17k £2.66k £143 £535 £4.04k
Total expenditure £3.50k £1.80k £1.40k £309 £2.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 26 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 257 days
Accounts and TAR 26 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 257 days
Annual return 26 October 2022 04 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 26 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 26 October 2021 28 September 2022 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 26 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 26 October 2020 24 March 2022 210 days late
Accounts and TAR 26 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 26 October 2019 13 January 2021 140 days late
Accounts and TAR 26 October 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Tremeirchion School
Tremeirchion
ST. ASAPH
LL17 0UN
Phone:
07966101499
Website:

No information available