THE TRUSTEES OF THE SAXON CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To own and preserve the Saxon Church of St Laurence in Bradford on Avon as well as the chapel of St Mary Tory, and to ensure that both are available for worship and visitors to enjoy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 24 May 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Dominic Tanfield | Chair | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jane Joanna Wilson | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Aaron Burchell | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Harriet Feilding | Trustee | 14 May 2014 |
|
|||||
Janice Margaret Dando | Trustee | 14 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.65k | £8.96k | £11.78k | £19.08k | £21.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.62k | £15.09k | £6.82k | £14.53k | £12.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 December 2023 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13 MAR 2013
Charitable objects
A) IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE OBJECTS OF THE ORIGINAL TRUST DEED A COPY OF WHICH ARE ANNEXED HERETO AND FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION AND CULTURE TO MAINTAIN AND DEVELOP THE SAXON CHURCH OF ST LAURENCE IN BRADFORD-ON-AVON FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS A LISTED MONUMENT AND PLACE OF CHRISTIAN WORSHIP. B) IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE OBJECTS OF THE ORIGINAL TRUST DEED A COPY OF WHICH ARE ANNEXED HERETO AND FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION AND CULTURE TO MAINTAIN AND DEVELOP THE CHAPEL OF ST MARY TORY IN BRADFORD-ON-AVON FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS A BUILDING OF HISTORIC AND CULTURAL INTEREST AND A PLACE OF CHRISTIAN WORSHIP.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Whiteheads Lane
Bradford-on-Avon
BA15 1JU
- Phone:
- 01225866205
- Email:
- harriet.f@icloud.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window