Financial history ICKENHAM YOUTH FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1152461
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £113.52k £111.13k £145.90k £140.38k £160.63k
Total expenditure £93.81k £75.55k £134.17k £140.60k £166.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A